IN2 HEALTH LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education, Training and Consultancy in Complementary and Alternative Medicine Complementary & Alternative Therapies: Acupuncture, Reflexology, Massage, Chinese Herbs, Physiotherapy, Osteopathy Classes in: Self Protection, Remedial & Rehabilitation Exercises, Makko-Ho, Sotai, Yoga, Taichi, Qigong, Martial Arts and Nutrition. Behavioural Management Training for Carers and Professionals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 May 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 29 April 2008: Standard registration
- 08 January 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/05/2019 | 04/05/2020 | 04/05/2021 | 04/05/2022 | 04/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.78k | £10.00k | £3.84k | £4.86k | £5.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.42k | £9.86k | £3.24k | £6.00k | £6.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 May 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 May 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 May 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 May 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE THE GENERAL ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND CONSULTANCY IN THE FIELD OF COMPLEMENTARY AND ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE. 2 TO IMPROVE AND ADVANCE HEALTH AND TO RELIEVE SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window