CANCER SUPPORT GROUP STOWMARKET AND DISTRICT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
support to people who are suffering or have suffered from cancer either financially or personally. We also support the families by trying to help relieve their distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 01 February 2008: Standard registration
- 12 March 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.14k | £4.21k | £1.08k | £1.18k | £280 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.98k | £3.47k | £2.68k | £763 | £2.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 17 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 16 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED (DATED) 30 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
1. TO GIVE SUPPORT TO PEOPLE WHO ARE SUFFERING AND WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM CANCER. 2. TO GIVE FINANCIAL HELP TO PEOPLE WHO ARE SUFFERING AND WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM CANCER. 3. TO HELP RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF THE FAMILIES OF CANCER SUFFERERS WITHIN STOWMARKET AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES
Area of benefit
STOWMARKET AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window