Financial history ANNOOR WELFARE TRUST (AWT)

Charity number: 1124481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £126.73k £173.33k £91.00k £53.98k £47.54k
Total expenditure £83.19k £175.56k £103.76k £67.63k £48.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A