ANNOOR WELFARE TRUST (AWT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our current activities are:We Distributed computers.Books & Supported to the needy people in Bangladesh for food Cloths & Free medical treatment. The trust works to eradicate poverty through international donation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 11 June 2008: Standard registration
- AN-NOOR WELFARE TRUST (AWT) (Previous name)
- JAMEA NOORANIA ISLAMIA TRUST (JNI) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOUSUF AHMED | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Tajul Islam | Trustee | 10 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
SABIHA ISLAM | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
FOZLU MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.73k | £173.33k | £91.00k | £53.98k | £47.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.19k | £175.56k | £103.76k | £67.63k | £48.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2023
(These accounts |
21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 3 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED ON 19 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
A) TO WORK FOR BETTER PROVISION OF EDUCATION TO THE DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE OF BANGLADESH AND PROVIDE THE MOTHER TONGUE AND CULTURAL EDUCATION TO THE CHILDREN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. B) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST BANGLADESHI ELDERLY PEOPLE. 2) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG CITIZENS OF BANGLADESH. C) TO WORK FOR THE ERADICATION OF POVERTY THROUGH INTERNATIONAL ASSISTED PROGRAMMERS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 5
Flamborough House
Clayton Road
London
SE15 5HZ
- Phone:
- 07886812897
- Email:
- annoorwelfaretrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window