GROUNDWORK LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment;to provide facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation and lesiure time occupation ; advance public education in environmental matters and to help people conserve, protect and improve their environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£32,416,121
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £32.02m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £398.99k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£32,351,866
Raising funds | £94.12k | |
Charitable activities | £32.26m | |
Other | £0 |
£132,691 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £16,459,123 from 149 government contract(s) and £2,671,865 from 67 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £94.12k | |
Charitable expenditure | £32.26m | |
Retained for future use | £64.26k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £94.12k | |
Charitable expenditure | £32.26m | |
Retained for future use | £196.95k |
People

492 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
16786 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN SMITH | Chair | 13 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Wen-Yu Weng | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Tony Beaman | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA BEER | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Alan Leake | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Taylor | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM BEAL | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.79m | £20.96m | £28.17m | £33.16m | £32.42m | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.23m | £20.87m | £27.78m | £32.92m | £32.35m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.19m | £9.49m | £16.05m | £21.31m | £16.46m | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.42m | £3.34m | £3.28m | £4.07m | £2.67m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £24.38m | £20.61m | £27.75m | £32.74m | £32.02m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £403.85k | £348.20k | £425.12k | £418.87k | £398.99k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £23.92m | £20.62m | £27.48m | £32.80m | £32.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £308.52k | £246.57k | £290.66k | £122.10k | £94.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £73.45k | £66.28k | £58.96k | £60.53k | £62.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £308.52k | £246.57k | £290.66k | £122.10k | £94.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.41m | £2.38m | £2.28m | £2.22m | £5.34m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.77m | £3.56m | £3.54m | £3.52m | £350.30k | |
|
Other assets | £12.94m | £13.58m | £15.33m | £15.60m | £15.65m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £8.17m | £8.35m | £9.30m | £9.52m | £9.33m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/05/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2012
Charitable objects
2.1) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN LONDON (THE AREA). 2.2) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE LIVING IN OR WORKING IN OR RESORTING TO THE AREA. 2.3) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS AND OF THE WAYS OF BETTER CONSERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE SAME WHERESOEVER. 2.4) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION WITHIN THE AREA BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 2.4.1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT; 2.4.2) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; 2.4.3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RE-TRAINING PARTICULARLY AMONGST UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 2.4.4) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESSES; OR II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 2.4.5) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORK SPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 2.4.6) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND TH IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; 2.4.7) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF ROUTEWAYS SUCH AS FOOTPATHS AND CYCLEWAYS AND ACCESS TO MAIN TRANSPORT ROUTES; 2.4.8) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; 2.4.9) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO BE REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; 2.4.10) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, INCLUDING THE RECLAMATION OF DERELICT LAND FOR USE AS OPEN SPACE; 2.4.11) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF SCHEMES TO PROMOTE HEALTHIER LIFESTYLES AND CRECHE FACILITIES TO INCREASE THE ABILITY OF PARENTS TO TAKE UP EMPLOYMENT; 2.4.12) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME, INCLUDING THE ALLEVIATION OF ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR; 2.4.13) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. 2.5) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE AREA BY: A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. 2.6) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN THIS ARTICLE AND IN ARTICLE 3.5 ABOVE MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS". 2.7) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES IN THE DIRECT FURTHERANCE OF THEIR OBJECTS (OR ANY ONE OF THEM) BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN THE ESTABLISHMENT, ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH CHARITIES INCLUDING ASSISTANCE OF ALL TYPES IN CONNECTION WITH THE RAISING AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS. 2.8 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO LOCAL COMMUNITY BASED GROUPS ANYWHERE IN THE AREA.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
GROUNDWORK
18-21 MORLEY STREET
LONDON
SE1 7QZ
- Phone:
- 02079221230
- Email:
- london@groundwork.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window