Trustees THE SANJAYA LALL MEMORIAL FUND
Charity number: 1121352

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Beata Javorcik | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor VINCENT CRAWFORD | Trustee | 02 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sir Professor Richard Peto | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ranjit Lall | Trustee | 12 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
RAMNIQUE LALL | Trustee | 23 October 2007 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR WALTER MATTLI | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.