CHILDREN'S HIV ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's current activities in furtherance of its objective include:1.Annual conference,autumn and regional meetings to disseminate latest updates on education and clinical practice in HIV and focus on important developments in standards of treatment and care 2.Website to include latest news,announcements and bulletin boards for healthcare professionals, children and youths living with HIV.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 January 2008: Standard registration
- 06 December 2023: Funds received from 1171488 EAST MIDLANDS SEXUAL HEALTH
- Chiva (Working name)
- CHILDRENS HIV ASSOCIATION OF UK AND IRELAND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr AMANDA WILLIAMS | Chair | 22 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Katie Warburton | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marthe Le Prevost | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Flint | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katja Doerholt | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Keiderling | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sujantha Nadarajah | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Prof Ali Judd | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Maburutse | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £325.87k | £777.38k | £4.89m | £215.80k | £470.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £315.71k | £254.25k | £444.08k | £594.02k | £759.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £3.42m | £4.00m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £173.36k | £188.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £3.41m | £4.00m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £98.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £600.00k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £242.65k | £405.53k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £11.60k | £38.55k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £7.35k | £27.23k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £28.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/08/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/12/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/08/2012
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE INFECTED OR AFFECTED BY HIV AND RELATED INFECTIONS INCLUDING THE DEVELOPMENT OF STANDARDS OF CARE AND PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO HEALTHCARE AND OTHER PROFESSIONALS AND IN OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS CHIVA, THROUGH ITS EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE, MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND MEDICAL FRATERNITY IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO HIV AND RELATED INFECTIONS INCLUDING RAISING AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH HIV AND RELATED INFECTIONS AND REPRESENTING THOSE NEEDS TO OTHER GOVERNMENT ORGANISATIONS AND PROFESSIONALS; AND C) TO CARRY OUT AND SUPPORT RESEARCH AND AUDIT INTO ALL ASPECTS OF HIV AND RELATED INFECTIONS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND AUDIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE: NATIONALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Orchard Street Business Centre
13-14 Orchard Street
BRISTOL
BS1 5EH
- Phone:
- 01179055149
- Email:
- message@chiva.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window