Accounts and annual returns NYARKO CLEFT CARE IN GHANA

Charity number: 1121946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 March 2025 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 March 2025 415 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 July 2022 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 April 2021 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required