THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH ROSS-ON-WYE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for the preservation, restoration, improvement and development of the church buildings, fabric, fittings, stained glass, ornaments, monuments and all other chattels in and belonging to the church of St. Mary the Virgin, Ross-on-Wye and its churchyard, and all additions thereto.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 18 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cameron Hill | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Lydia Newman | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Mary Kercher | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Russell Elliott Baker | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bill Fulp | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Mary Utting | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Mark Sanderson | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER MARK BARTRUM | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Graham Maldwyn John | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.71k | £16.11k | £3.12k | £4.41k | £38.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.83k | £35.87k | £1.41k | £11.31k | £22.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 March 2025 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 March 2025 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 July 2021 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE CHURCH BUILDINGS, FABRIC, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS, MONUMENTS AND ALL OTHER CHATTELS IN AND BELONGING TO THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, ROSS-ON-WYE, IN THE DIOCESE OF HEREFORD, AND ITS CHURCHYARD, AND ALL ADDITIONS THERETO.
Area of benefit
ROSS-ON-WYE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Parish Office
The Rectory
Church Street
ROSS-ON-WYE
Herefordshire
- Phone:
- 01989 565386
- Email:
- info@fosmross.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window