THE COMMUNITY OF ORTHODOX CHRISTIANS OF RUSSIAN TRADITION IN OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Orthodox Parish of the Annunciation in Oxford is a parish of the Deanery of Great Britain and Ireland, within the Archdiocese of Thyateira and Great Britain under the Ecumenical Patriarchate (of Constantinople). It is a worshipping community of Orthodox Christians open to all regardless of their nationality, language or cultural background.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 07 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Austin | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Isam Ayoub Karim Jajawi | Trustee | 22 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Freemantle-Schremp | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Joshua Christian Townson | Trustee | 21 February 2021 |
|
|||||||
Ion Baleanu | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
KEVIN MAURICE SERAPHIM ALTON HONEYWELL | Trustee | 27 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
Tuija Anneli Vanttinen-Newton | Trustee | 30 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Rev leslie vanttinen-newton | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.77k | £30.98k | £40.87k | £27.89k | £49.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.40k | £36.60k | £37.32k | £39.53k | £44.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH WITHIN THE COUNTY OF OXFORDSHIRE AND THE ADJACENT COUNTIES AND, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION: A TO MAINTAIN OR ASSIST IN MAINTAINING A CHURCH OR CHURCHES WHERE CANONICAL ORTHODOX LITURGICAL WORSHIP IS CELEBRATED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CANON LAW OF THE ORTHODOX CHURCH; PROVIDED THAT IN DOING SO THE PARISH COUNCIL MUST ENSURE THAT, AS FAR AS PRACTICABLE, THE STYLE OF WORSHIP CONFORMS TO THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX TRADITION WHILST HAVING REGARD TO: I THE DIVERSITY OF CULTURAL AND LINGUISTIC BACKGROUNDS REPRESENTED IN THE CONGREGATION, AND II THE PRACTICE AND CUSTOM OF THE PARISH AS IT HAS DEVELOPED BETWEEN ITS FOUNDATION IN 1959 AND THE DATE OF THE PARISH MEETING ON 30 JUNE 2006. B TO PROMOTE THE TEACHING OF THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH SERMONS, LECTURES, DISCUSSION GROUPS, CATECHISM CLASSES AND PUBLICATIONS AND THROUGH THEOLOGICAL OR OTHER SCHOOLS OR CONFERENCES. C TO MAKE POSSIBLE THE RECEPTION INTO THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH OF ALL THOSE WHO FREELY DECIDE AND SINCERELY DESIRE TO ADOPT THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO LIVE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ITS TEACHING; AND D TO PROMOTE THE PRACTICE OF THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH THE ORGANISATION OF YOUTH GROUPS, STUDY GROUP SEMINARS AND OTHER SPIRITUAL, CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE COUNTY OF OXFORDSHIRE AND THE ADJACENT COUNTIES
Linked charities
- 07 February 2008 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 OXLEASE
WITNEY
OX28 3QX
- Phone:
- 07900504262
- Email:
- frseraphimvnewton@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window