ISLAND FARM DONKEY SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
House donkeys and some other animals who are neglected and abused.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darren James Kidley | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Michael Francis Kidley | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET KIDLEY | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.25k | £119.51k | £374.37k | £523.82k | £405.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.30k | £181.63k | £218.66k | £277.85k | £286.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £375.26k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £45.11k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £99.12k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.33k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £287.55k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.48k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £269.37k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.78k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/04/2007 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 07/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/05/2015
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PROVISION OF CARE, PROTECTION AND/OR PERMANENT SECURITY FOR ANIMALS, ESPECIALLY BY NOT EXHAUSTIVELY DONKEYS, WHICH ARE IN NEED OF ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCE, ILL-USAGE OR OTHER LIKE CAUSES AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS; 3.2 THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RIDING SO THAT ALL DISABLED PERSONS WHO WOULD BENEFIT IN THEIR MENTAL OR PHYSICAL HEALTH FROM RIDING SHALL BE GIVEN THE OPPORTUNITY TO DO SO.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Island Farm Donkey Sanctuary
Old Didcot Road
Brightwell-Cum-Sotwell
WALLINGFORD
Oxfordshire
OX10 0SW
- Phone:
- 01491 833938
- Email:
- mail@donkeyrescue.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window