PARASOL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
raising funds for injured military personnel (including mental health) and their families to provided them with dignity and needs . Activities such as Challenges, golf day,Charity Dinners organised to raise the funds and profile. auctioning of donated items at dinners and event days
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russell Spencer Martin Jones | Chair | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Uttsavkumar Bharatkumar Patel | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
anjna patel MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.72k | £0 | £565 | £10.59k | £11.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.65k | £0 | £13.25k | £7.98k | £9.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 February 2025 | 606 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 20 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST PERSONS, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, WHO HAVE BEEN WOUNDED OR INJURED WHILST SERVING IN THE ARMED FORCES ("BENEFICIARIES") AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, WHO ARE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF SICKNESS, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT, OR SERVICES FOR BENEFICIARIES TO SUPPORT THEIR TREATMENT AND REHABILITATION WHICH ARE NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES; AND (2) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE FOR BENEFICIARIES TO SUPPORT THEIR TRANSITION TO CIVILIAN LIFE; AND (3) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, LOANS, ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR BENEFICIARIES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAWKSMOOR DRIVE
43
Perton
Wolverhampton
Stafford
- Phone:
- 07970085008
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window