THE FRIENDS OF HOLY TRINITY ACADEMY CALNE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds to provide our school with those extra items and equipment that cannot be provided through the school budget. Our aim is to enhance the school experience for all pupils at the school. We have provided an IT suite of laptop computers, adventure play equipment, playground signs and most recently decorated and equipped an international music room.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 22 November 2007: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF HOLY TRINITY SCHOOL CALNE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Vallis | Chair | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.98k | £6.02k | £5.59k | £6.45k | £9.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.20k | £1.84k | £7.88k | £3.62k | £5.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 673 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 673 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1038 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1038 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1403 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1403 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1768 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1768 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/04/2006 AS AMENDED ON 15/01/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WILTSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Peregrine Court
Calne
SN11 9RY
- Phone:
- 01249812796
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window