WELLINGORE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF WELLINGORE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT ANY DISTINCTION FOR A WIDE RANGE OF ACTIVITIES, AVAILABLE AND ACCESSIBLE TO ALL MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 11 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Petrovic | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Gardiner | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Brumhead | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Jones | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Wilson | Trustee | 18 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.55k | £19.70k | £41.35k | £41.73k | £39.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.18k | £19.00k | £37.60k | £37.46k | £42.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION SEALED 5 JUNE 1981
Charitable objects
3. OBJECT OF CHARITY, - (L) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WELLINGORE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURETIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (2) THE SAID LAND AND BUILDINGS SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL AS AFORESAID.,
Area of benefit
WELLINGORE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wellingore Memorial Hall
Memorial Hall Drive
Wellingore
Lincoln
LN5 0BD
- Phone:
- 07746175407
- Email:
- financial.wmh@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window