BRINGING HOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACTIVITIES COMMENCED IN APRIL 2008 INCLUDED WORKING WITH PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND RACES IN ORDER TO BRING ABOUT IMPROVEMENTS IN SOCIAL COMMUNITY AND SOCIAL SAFETY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £120,364 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Bristol City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Manchester City
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENNIS STORROD | Chair | 14 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Neil Appleby | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ADELE MELAINE KALSI | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL VINCENT ROBERT | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SALLY BATEMAN | Trustee | 14 June 2014 |
|
|||||
GRACE BALLY-BALOGUN | Trustee | 14 June 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239.50k | £299.85k | £304.06k | £554.61k | £432.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £202.23k | £300.34k | £302.47k | £406.73k | £424.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £120.36k | |
|
Income from government grants | £105.21k | £149.06k | £146.13k | £298.72k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £552.55k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.98k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £86 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £400.27k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.46k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.35k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 6 JUNE 2007 AS AMENDED 19 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
AS AN EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN WITNESS, LOVE AND CONCERN, TO UNDERTAKE ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING:- 1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) ENGAGING WITH CHRISTIAN GROUPS IN ORDER TO PROMOTE PRAYER AND MISSIONARY ACTIVITIES IN LINE WITH BRINGING HOPE'S FOCUS; 2 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE AFFECTED DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY THROUGH THE MISUSE OF DRUGS, ALCOHOL, GUNS AND KNIVES; 3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH (INCLUDING FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT PHYSICAL HEALTH, MENTAL HEALTH, EMOTIONAL HEALTH AND SPIRITUAL HEALTH) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE TO THOSE AT RISK IN RELATION TO THE ABOVE; AND 4 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRINGING HOPE
88 Soho Road
Handsworth
Birmingham
- Phone:
- 07816535748
- Email:
- info@bringinghope.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window