ELLIE'S HAVEN - CORNWALL LIMITED

Charity number: 1121426
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Ellie's Haven's primary objective is to bring relief to families caring round-the-clock for children with long-term medical conditions, by offering them holidays and short breaks in a safe, tranquil, supportive environment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022

Total income: £70,071
Total expenditure: £104,590

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 October 2007: Standard registration
  • 04 April 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 04 April 2025: Funds transferred to 1193660 KIDS-IN-ACTION
  • 04 April 2025: Funds transferred to 1193660 KIDS-IN-ACTION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £51.34k £49.03k £93.07k £66.32k £70.07k
Total expenditure £57.56k £71.33k £79.01k £77.37k £104.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 March 2023 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 20 March 2023 43 days late
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window