GNG COMMUNITY SERVICES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's main activity is to provide childcare for children aged 0 to 5 years. The charity operates within Blakenhall, Wolverhampton and works with the local council and community in order to offer a range of funded and private nursery places. The charity also operates a Khalsa School from its premises at the weekends, providing further educational services to the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 18 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GURDIAL SINGH DHALIWAL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sukhbinder Singh Sandhu | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DILBAG SINGH MANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HARBHAJAN SINGH SANDHU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £358.93k | £327.13k | £327.67k | £400.25k | £358.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353.22k | £307.66k | £362.35k | £382.69k | £388.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 10 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
WITHIN THE CITY OF WOLVERHAMPTON AND IN PARTICULAR WITHIN THE AREA OF BLAKENHALL ('THE PRIMARY AREA OF BENEFIT') A) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING WITHIN THE PRIMARY AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE, AND PROVIDING AND ORGANISING A CHILDCARE NURSERY, PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATION AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: I) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; II) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
WOLVERHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
GNG BUILDING
BAGGOTT STREET
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV2 3AP
- Phone:
- 01902399576
- Email:
- singhuk@khalsa.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window