Financial history THE HENRY VAN STRAUBENZEE MEMORIAL FUND

Charity Number: 1121376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £415.64k £127.60k £143.32k £146.70k £24.75k
Total expenditure £388.06k £175.06k £185.45k £208.30k £184.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A