Financial history CHARITY VOICE

Charity number: 1122164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £11.60k £0 £0 £0 £650
Total expenditure £18.17k £2.64k £60 £560 £1.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A