GUITAR AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing guitars to individuals and organisations where it is difficult to obtain or purchase them. For the purpose of developing music skills and promoting praise and worship in Churches and youth groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
- Austria
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Bulgaria
- Cambodia
- Colombia
- Croatia
- Czech Republic
- Egypt
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- Hungary
- India
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Kosovo
- Lebanon
- Macedonia
- Moldova
- Philippines
- Poland
- Romania
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Vietnam
Governance
- 04 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT SUMNER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BENJAMIN SUMNER | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANNE SUMNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL WILLIAM ABLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN TERENCE SUMNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.34k | £13.49k | £16.34k | £24.56k | £24.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.71k | £6.17k | £34.05k | £18.17k | £23.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
1. TO SUPPORT CHRISTIAN CHURCHES, INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS IN IMPACTING THEIR COMMUNITIES. 2. TO PROVIDE MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS TO PEOPLE WHO OTHERWISE COULD NOT AFFORD THEM THEREFORE ENABLING THEM TO CONTRIBUTE IN THE LIFE OF THEIR CHURCH THROUGH MUSIC. 3. TO PROMOTE PRAISE AND WORSHIP IN THE CONTEXT OF THE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY. 4. TO EQUIP AND ENCOURAGE CHURCHES IN ADOPTING METHODS FOR DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE WORSHIP AND PRAISE MINISTRY. 5. TO PURCHASE AND DISTRIBUTE HIGH QUALITY INSTRUMENTS FOR THE LEAST POSSIBLE COST. 6. TO EMPOWER INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN CONTACTS TO DISTRIBUTE INSTRUMENTS AS THEY SEE FIT. 7. TO DEVELOP LONG TERM AND ONGOING RELATIONSHIPS WITH INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS IN PROVIDING BETTER QUALITY INSTRUMENTS WHERE MUSICAL SKILLS AND CAPABILITIES PROGRESS SIGNIFICANTLY. 8. TO PROVIDE SMALL GIFTS AND DONATIONS IN CIRCUMSTANCES CONSISTENT WITH THE OVERALL OBJECTIVES OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
94 GLOUCESTER ROAD
EXETER
EX4 2ED
- Phone:
- 07808664640
- Email:
- GUITARAID90@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window