THE FINNIS SCOTT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make grants and donations to individuals and institutions as they see fit. The Trustees will have due regard to the late Lady Scott's interest in horticulture as well as the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE HONOURABLE MRS URSULA MARGARET BRIDGET WIDE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
William Colacicchi | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lord Charles Scott | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Patricia Rose Morison | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES PERCY MILLER | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|||||
LADY KATHRYN GAYLE ELIZABETH ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr WILLIAM BRENT ELLIOTT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £360.78k | £274.52k | £345.35k | £363.64k | £384.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £442.83k | £222.39k | £321.43k | £381.22k | £390.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 7 FEBRUARY 1998 AND CODICIL DATED 22 JUNE 2004 AS PROVED IN THE HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE DATED 27 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED 19 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES (BEING AT LEAST TWO IN NUMBER) MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HCR HEWITSONS
LANCASTER HOUSE
NUNN MILLS ROAD
NORTHAMPTON
NN1 5GE
- Phone:
- 01604233233
- Email:
- amoon@hcrlaw.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window