FAMILIES OF CHILDREN UNITED SUPPORT (FOCUS)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOCUS is a parenting and support programme at Saunderton Lodge. We support families using the recognised PAFT programme. Our all age project worker assists the residents with lifestyle support and training. Our PAFT trained staff use a programme based around a combination of personal visits and group meetings.. Support can continue after the residents have left Saunderton Lodge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 18 December 2007: Standard registration
- 26 October 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.07k | £19.41k | £25.24k | £15.24k | £10.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.58k | £19.69k | £21.13k | £18.02k | £18.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 02 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 03 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 05 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 05 September 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 13 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 OCTOBER 2007 AS AMENDED 10 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH OF MOTHERS AND THEIR CHILDREN, FROM BIRTH TO THE AGE OF 5, WHO ARE RESIDENT AT SAUNDERTON LODGE AND TO ASSIST IN THE RE-SETTLEMENT OF FORMER RESIDENTS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window