HARAMBEE FOR KENYA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This is a charity that assists street children in Kenya by giving them either a safe house in which to live or in Foster Care (whichever is appropriate). It also ensures they are fed, cared for mediacally and receive an education to help them become valued members of society. The charity works closely with local people who are respected and have a heart for these deprived children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kenya
Governance
- 14 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Lindon Nixon | Chair | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Curtis Mansfield | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Parker | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JAMES COMPTON | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAQUELINE COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BENJAMIN DAVID VINCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLEY FLORENCE DANN | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROGER ALBERT SIDNEY DANN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.71k | £63.78k | £41.09k | £47.48k | £35.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.41k | £34.03k | £40.10k | £43.10k | £47.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 NOVEMBER 2007 as amended on 14 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS OF STREET CHILDREN IN KENYA. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STREET CHILDREN IN KENYA.
Area of benefit
KENYA
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 CUCKMERE RISE
HEATHFIELD
TN21 8PG
- Phone:
- 01435865502
- Email:
- h4kchairman@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window