Trustees UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE PATCHAM

Charity number: 1121397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Gloyn Chair 29 November 2021
None on record
Christine Young Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
GILLIAN MASEFIELD Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Caroline Thomas Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Carol Hobden Trustee 18 November 2019
None on record
Ann Heale Trustee 18 November 2019
None on record
SUSAN SEYMOUR Trustee 20 November 2017
None on record
MARGARET STEWART Trustee 21 November 2016
None on record
JEANETTE FAKES Trustee 21 November 2016
None on record