THE CHAYA REIZEL HIRSCH MEMORIAL FUND LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is raising funds to invest in assets which will provide income . The trustees will then distribute income in accordance with its objects which are to advance education and religion in accordance with the Orthodox Jewish religion and to relieve pverty in the Jewish Community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Manchester City
- Salford City
Governance
- 25 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Berusch KRAUSZ | Trustee |
|
||||||
MEILECH RUDZINSKI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HENIA ESTHER RUDZINSKI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.00k | £126.04k | £196.22k | £258.31k | £136.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £677.00k | £695.60k | £487.21k | £359.62k | £488.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 November 2024 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 November 2024 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 February 2024 | 241 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 February 2024 | 241 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 144 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF ORTHODOX JUDAISM. 3 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO THOSE IN NEED IN THE JEWISH COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
129 LEICESTER ROAD
SALFORD
M7 4HJ
- Phone:
- 07968500682
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window