WHITE RIBBON CAMPAIGN LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A detailed 2013 annual report is available from the office. The charity campaigns against violence against women and girls particularly within the areas of sport, music, fund raising, and education. White Ribbon Status is available to various authorities and organisations within the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4050 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 April 2008: Standard registration
- WHITE RIBBON CAMPAIGN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER LASSEY | Chair | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amy Keirl | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Henry Hughes | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael Taggart | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Fairman | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James Duerden | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steve Barnbrook | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.64k | £111.91k | £242.23k | £366.76k | £368.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.02k | £135.71k | £146.44k | £341.74k | £335.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.00k | £5.24k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 23 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF LIFE AND GOOD HEALTH BY THE PREVENTION OF VIOLENCE, IN PARTICULAR AGAINST WOMEN, BY EDUCATING AND RAISING AWARENESS OF THE CAUSE EFFECT AND METHODS OF PREVENTING VIOLENCE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 31
The Town Hall
St. Georges Street
HEBDEN BRIDGE
West Yorkshire
HX7 7BY
- Phone:
- 01422886545
- Email:
- info@whiteribbon.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window