WILLOW TREE FAMILY FARM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATIONAL AND LEISURE SERVICES, Sports, Nature, horticulture, social health and wellbeing, unemployment, disadvantaged families and disability in children and adults
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
71 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 21 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ANTHONY TAYLOR | Chair | 01 August 2012 |
|
|||||
Dawn Mason-Meakin | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jade Alexandra Fletcher | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ADAM HIND | Trustee | 01 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.88k | £269.22k | £446.56k | £425.87k | £425.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.79k | £212.67k | £367.05k | £405.68k | £420.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.56k | £24.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 AUGUST 2003.
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECT OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF THEIR AGE, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR CULTURE, POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OPINIONS, IN AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, CONSERVATION, THE CARE AND CONSIDERATION OF ALL ANIMALS AND OTHER ASSOCIATED SUBJECTS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFNED. IN PRACTICE: IN THE SHIREBROOK, BOLSOVER AREA OF DERBYSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Willow Tree Family Farm
Langwith Road
Shirebrook
Mansfield
NG20 8TF
- Phone:
- 01623748808
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window