Accounts and annual returns ST MICHAEL'S POOL MINEHEAD

Charity number: 1121725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 12 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 12 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 09 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 09 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 February 2023 243 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 October 2022 462 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required