LIVE LIFE GIVE LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity exists to save and improve the lives of organ and tissue transplant patients in the UK. This is done through media campaigns, giving talks and presentations, organsation of key public events and distribution of information. The charity also runs the Internet forum 'Intoto', the balloon scheme 'Robyn's Rainbows' and a training programme entitled 'The Speakers Project'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 March 2008: Standard registration
- 09 February 2022: Funds received from 1167204 BLOOMINYORKSHIRE
- LIVE LIFE THEN GIVE LIFE (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgia Wilding | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Marie Prosser | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Luke Yates | Trustee | 04 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROYDON TURNER | Trustee | 30 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MANDY VENTERS | Trustee | 04 August 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.87k | £33.21k | £25.18k | £80.26k | £39.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.93k | £98.23k | £34.67k | £36.36k | £29.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 09 September 2024 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 23 October 2023 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 August 2022 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 07/07/2007 AS AMENDED ON 26/02/2008 AS AMENDED ON 01/07/2014
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN THE UK WHO HAVE HAD OR ARE HOPING TO HAVE AN ORGAN/TISSUE TRANSPLANT, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: - IMPROVING THE SUPPLY OF HUMAN ORGANS AND TISSUE AVAILABLE FOR TRANSPLANTATION THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN ORGAN AND TISSUE DONATION. - IMPROVING EQUITY OF ACCESS TO ORGAN DONATION AND TRANSPLANTATION FOR ALL. - THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES OF BENEFIT. - SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO HUMAN ORGAN DONATION AND BY ENSURING THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THAT RESEARCH. - THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC AWARENESS AND RECOGNITION OF ORGAN AND TISSUE DONORS AND THEIR FAMILIES. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO ORGAN DONATION AND TRANSPLANTATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THROUGHOUT ENGLAND & WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Live Life Give Life
PO Box 12
LONDON
WC1N 3XX
- Phone:
- 02032875595
- Email:
- info@livelifegivelife.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window