PARKS AND GARDENS DATA SERVICES LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parks & Gardens UK is a unique national web resource which provides database record information, educational articles and other resources on parks, gardens and designed landscapes in the United Kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 May 2009: Standard registration
- 26 October 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 26 October 2018: Funds transferred to 1060000 HESTERCOMBE GARDENS TRUST LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.24k | £23.35k | £24.22k | £61.20k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.45k | £29.99k | £22.43k | £21.00k | £6.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 05 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 03 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 03 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 15 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 15 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JUNE 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 24 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING RESOURCES AND PERFORMING RESEARCH INTO HISTORICAL PARKS AND GARDENS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window