BENINGTON COMMUNITY HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Benington Community Heritage Trust was formed in November 2007 to preserve for the benefit of the people of Benington village and the nation the historical, architectural and constructional heritage in and around Benington village. The first project being considered is the acquisition, restoration and adaptation of the redundant church of All Saints for a new use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £91,551 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 26 November 2007: Standard registration
- 07 April 2021: Funds received from 521782 BENINGTON VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
caroline greaves | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glen Reynolds | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
suzanne peck | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Manda Louise Crowder | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
kevin pinner | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £603.72k | £174.50k | £223.42k | £113.39k | £251.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £613.60k | £89.02k | £105.51k | £168.61k | £334.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £588.68k | £11.85k | £7.66k | £72.04k | £91.55k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £599.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £107 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £87.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £526.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £18.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £504.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2020
(These accounts |
30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 JULY 2007 as amended on 29 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF BENINGTON VILLAGE AND OF THE NATION, THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND BENINGTON VILLAGE IN BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY STRUCTURE OR ERECTION, AND ANY PART OF A BUILDING AS SO DEFINED) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST
Area of benefit
BENINGTON VILLAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Beonna at All Saints
Main Road
Benington
BOSTON
PE22 0BT
- Phone:
- 01205 760060
- Email:
- info@thebeonna.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window