INTERNATIONAL ISLAMIC RELIEF ORGANISATION (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IIROUK is primarily concerned with the provision of humanitarian aid for the benefit of those in need, especially orphans and widows, including the provision of the basic necessities of life, education and training. The trustees are currently involved in establishing and staffing their London office and designing the IIROUK website. Our initial projects will be UK based, insh'Allah.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- IIROUK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.92k | £157.96k | £70.03k | £1.22k | £928 | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.25k | £62.26k | £130.43k | £9.82k | £772 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 22 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 22 June 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/08/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/08/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM (THE UK) AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO: 1. RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR ORPHANS, WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED OR WHOSE LIVES HAVE BEEN IMPACTED OR AFFECTED BY POVERTY, ILLNESS OR CIVIL CONFLICT; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE FAITH AND RELIGIOUS PRACTICES OF ISLAM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 4. THE RELIEF OF NEED AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT; 5. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 6. THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE BOARD MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window