GURU GOBIND SINGH STUDY CIRCLE UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GGSSC UK was founded in 2003 with faith classes and weekly kirtan program. We have organized programmes at countless homes but for its active and self-less services we are now working in 4 active locations. Basically we are working in the children and youth to touch their lives through innovative Gurmat quizzes, poetry, lecture competitions and personality development camps.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Harrow
- Hounslow
- Slough
Governance
- 21 July 2008: Standard registration
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.36k | £4.31k | £6.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £4.28k | £5.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 26 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 27 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE SIKH FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY CREATING AWARENESS ABOUT THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF SIKHISM; AND B) TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY HOLDING PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND PROVIDING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON SIKHISM.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window