DEDDINGTON PRIMARY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO SUPPORT THE ACTIVITIES OF DEDDINGTON PRIMARY SCHOOL, TO FUND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES, AND TO SUPPORT SUCH EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AS DEEMED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 05 November 2007: Standard registration
- 09 February 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 July 2011: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE EVANS | Chair | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Alan Collins | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Denise Welch | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | £80 | £727 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £198 | £0 | £15.00k | £25.00k | £30.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 191 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
1 TO SUPPORT SUCH EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OTHER THAN THOSE FUNDED BY THE GOVERNMENT OR LOCAL AUTHORITY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT. 2 TO SUPPORT SUCH OTHER EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AS OUGHT TO BE FUNDED BY THE GOVERNMENT OR LOCAL AUTHORITY BUT ARE NOT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEDDINGTON PRIMARY SCHOOL
EARLS LANE
DEDDINGTON
BANBURY
OX15 0TJ
- Phone:
- 01869 338430
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window