THE POETRY TRANSLATION CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Poetry Translation Centre enriches poetry in English by commissioning and promoting translation of contemporary poetry from Africa, Asia and Latin America to a high literary standard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £138,171 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bohdan Andrzej Piasecki | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tatevik Sargsyan | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Jorge Llorens Ferrero | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Janet Sarah Remmington | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alireza Hassani | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.61k | £252.06k | £235.46k | £223.25k | £173.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £244.95k | £213.95k | £206.73k | £228.02k | £228.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £183.83k | £149.37k | £151.07k | £179.87k | £138.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES (INCORPORATED) 16 JULY 2007 (AMENDED BY RESOLUTION) 25 FEBRUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 SEP 2014
Charitable objects
3.1.A)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF POETRY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY TRANSLATING INTO ENGLISH AND MAKING AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC CONTEMPORARY POETRY FROM NON-EUROPEAN COUNTRIES B) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT ISSUES RELATING TO IMMIGRANT COMMUNITIES BY INTRODUCING THE PUBLIC TO IMMIGRANT COMMUNITIES CONTEMPORARY POETRY AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT."
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE POETRY TRANSLATION CENTRE
The Albany
Albany Centre & Theatre
Douglas Way
Deptford
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07785568412
- Email:
- info@poetrytranslation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window