CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH-MOUNTAIN OF SALVATION/END TIME REVIVAL MINISTRY (MOSEREM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the Christian faith through holding meetings and services for the worship of God. This is done by the study of the bible, proclamation of the gospel/fellowship of Christian believers. Also communicating the Christian faith to the wider world/public. Relieving the sick, financial hardship and promoting and preserving good health - this is done by praying for the sick that we come across e
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 July 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southwark
Governance
- 05 November 2007: Standard registration
- CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH-MOUNTAIN OF SALVATION (MOSEREM) (Previous name)
- END TIME APOSTOLIC CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLUFUNMILAYO TAIWO IGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Olusayo Felix Komolafe | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
RAPHAEL OLUKOREDE IBIDAPO ODULATE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OLAYINKA SOLOMON OLANIPEKUN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/07/2018 | 01/07/2019 | 01/07/2020 | 01/07/2021 | 01/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.01k | £15.41k | £15.76k | £20.59k | £24.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.51k | £8.47k | £11.82k | £18.24k | £1.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 July 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days | |
Annual return | 01 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 387 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 387 days | |
Annual return | 01 July 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2021 | 03 October 2022 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2020 | 20 June 2022 | 415 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 SEPTEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED ON 01 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED ON 06 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST 2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
88 Westbrooke Road
WELLING
Kent
DA16 1PY
- Phone:
- 07932723909
- Email:
- etacuk@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window