ALL SAINTS HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 1123646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide local TV and radio network for the community development purposes as well as educational and training programmes to all persons especially the young and old.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £1,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PHILIP ST JOHN-FOTI Trustee 03 November 2021
None on record
CLAIRE ASKHAM Trustee 06 September 2011
None on record
BLAIR MONTAGUE-DRAKE Trustee 06 September 2011
None on record
ANNA ST JOHN-FOTI Trustee 06 September 2011
None on record
CHRIS ST JOHN-FOTI Trustee 09 March 2011
None on record
KATHY BELTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 20 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 16 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 07 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
78 Brook Lane
Felixstowe
Suffolk
IP11 7LB
Phone:
01394279839
Website:

No information available