PEARL OF AFRICA CHILD CARE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In line with our chief objects to support schoolchildren in Uganda, especially those who are vulnerable and whose lives are affected by poverty and/or the AIDS epidemic, our main work has been to support and raise funds for the Molly & Paul Childcare Foundation of Uganda.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
37 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Uganda
Governance
- 15 February 2008: Standard registration
- THE PEARL OF AFRICA CHILDRENS CHOIR LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN GRANT WHAITE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jennifer Griffiths | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leonie Claire Bell | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Tonge | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Angela Tonge | Trustee | 24 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Becs Brocken | Trustee | 25 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.08k | £108.19k | £73.26k | £55.24k | £171.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.73k | £118.48k | £117.79k | £76.82k | £124.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WIDOWS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND TO SOURCE AND PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS FOR SCHOOLS AND SPONSORSHIP FOR SCHOOL CHILDREN IN UGANDA; AND 2) TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WHO ARE VICTIMS OF AIDS AND WAR IN AFRICA AND THOSE WHO ARE SUFFERING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT.
Area of benefit
UGANDA AND OTHER PARTS OF AFRICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Seltirk
Station Road
Gilwern
ABERGAVENNY
Gwent
NP7 0BY
- Phone:
- 07875002200
- Email:
- lynnpreece@ymail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window