UKR - AID
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIEF OF THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN IN UKRAINE WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED, BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THEIR PLIGHT AND BY PROVIDING GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
- Ukraine
Governance
- 21 January 2008: Standard registration
- 08 January 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2013 | 30/03/2014 | 30/03/2015 | 30/03/2016 | 30/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.62k | £643 | £695 | £1.08k | £1.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.07k | £73 | £73 | £73 | £573 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2017 | 25 February 2018 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2016 | 27 February 2017 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2015 | 04 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 DECEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN IN UKRAINE WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THEIR PLIGHT AND BY PROVIDING GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window