THE BRITISH MERCANTILE MARINE MEMORIAL COLLECTION LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 July 2008: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE MERCANTILE MARINE MEMORIAL COLLECTION LTD (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 OCTOBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 2 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF PAINTINGS AND OTHER ARTEFACTS HELD WITHIN THE MERCANTILE MARINE MEMORIAL COLLECTION, (THE COLLECTION), WITH THE INTENTION OF THE COLLECTION BEING MADE AVAILABLE FOR PUBLIC VIEWING, IN WHOLE OR IN PART ON A ROTATING BASIS, IN ORDER TO ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION OF THIS PART OF THE NATION'S HERITAGE AND TO PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING OF THE ROLE PLAYED BY THE MERCHANT NAVY IN THE NATION'S HISTORY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window