Financial history COMMUNITY CHURCH HARLESDEN

Charity number: 1121958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £78.72k £69.29k £71.58k £88.48k £74.86k
Total expenditure £68.62k £72.65k £64.72k £69.72k £60.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A