RAFFA INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT AGENCY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAFFA ACCADEMY RAFFA LOCAL RENEWAL AND ADVANCEMENT PROGRAMME ESTABLISHING DEVELOPMENT PRACTITIONERS LINKS WITH LOCAL COMMUNITIES UNDERTAKING SUSTAINABLE PROJECTS RAISE EDUCATIONAL ATTAINMENT RAFFA HEALTH & CARE GROUP - 'BATTLEFIELD OF THE MIND ON FAITH AND SPIRITUALITY IN MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES' RAFFA AID DONATIONS CLOTHING EQUIPMENTS, EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,332 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dominican Republic
- Georgia
- Ghana
- Haiti
- Jamaica
- Nigeria
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- St Lucia
Governance
- 05 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BISHOP WILTON RALPH OBE POWELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jonathan Laing | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Laing | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Graham | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Douglas | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
TEDROY MILTON POWELL | Trustee | 31 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Monica Coke | Trustee | 10 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev RAYMOND VEIRA | Trustee | 30 July 2013 |
|
|||||
Rev MICHAEL WILSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
BISHOP BASIL RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LLEWELLYN FITZROY GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.30k | £7.49k | £66.29k | £28.96k | £74.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.38k | £7.07k | £47.45k | £43.45k | £76.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £22.88k | £7.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES (INCORPORATED) 24 OCTOBER 2006 AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 13 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO BE EFFECTED WORLD-WIDE("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND ARE AS FOLLOWS 3.1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF PEOPLE LIVING IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES
Area of benefit
WORLD WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 BEACON COURT
BIRMINGHAM ROAD
GREAT BARR
BIRMINGHAM
WEST MID
- Phone:
- 07957144956
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window