Accounts and annual returns CHILD EDUCATION NEPAL UK

Charity number: 1122259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 June 2023 237 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 February 2022 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 February 2022 97 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window