TRELAWNY OVERSEAS RELIEF ASSOCIATION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information and advice on existing publice service including social welfare and amenities,guidance-counselling and other employment training for young people,as well as health-living(through a luncheon/relaxation club) for the elderly from the BME community in walsall and its environs.TO provide specialist service in information access,guidance, networking,luncheon club and other socially interact
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Walsall
- Jamaica
Governance
- 15 February 2008: Standard registration
- 31 January 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 MARCH 2004.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE WALSALL METROPOLITAN BOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER TH SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISZATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. TO RELIEVE POVERTY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND AMONGST COMMUNITIES IN JAMAICA BY THE PROVISION OF GOODS, CLOTHING, EQUIPMENT AND OTHER SUPPORT CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THEIR CHARITABLE NEEDS AND ANYTHING INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THIS OBJECT.
Area of benefit
THE WALSALL METROPOLITAN BOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, AND IN JAMAICA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window