Financial history FRIENDS OF FLINTSHIRE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1122707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £23.63k £497 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £26.08k £8.82k £648 £0 £144
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A