Financial history CEEM LTD

Charity Number: 1122115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £19.62k £20.37k £18.95k £18.81k £26.88k
Total expenditure £20.90k £12.13k £20.82k £26.07k £25.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A