Financial history HEALTH AND WELLBEING TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1122079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £65.99k £77.07k £63.93k £14.31k £91.36k
Total expenditure £58.28k £63.13k £66.08k £42.26k £78.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A