FOUNDATIONSTONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Two donations £500 each both within UK. Donations aimed at assisting other registered charities or charitable ventures in their relatively early stages
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bolivia
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Cameroon
- Colombia
- Costa Rica
- Dominican Republic
- Ecuador
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- Guyana
- India
- Indonesia
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Malaysia
- Mauritius
- Nepal
- Nicaragua
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Pakistan
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Scotland
- Somalia
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Uruguay
- Vietnam
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 08 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAM EVERINGTON | Chair |
|
||||||
Romi Everington | Trustee | 09 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER DEVAS EVERINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY ELLEN ELPHICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TOM ALLASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HARRY EDWARD MARKHAM STONE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £358 | £10 | £72 | £19 | £1.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £902 | £123 | £0 | £6 | £1.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 28 September 2024 | 237 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 28 September 2024 | 602 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 28 September 2024 | 967 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 28 September 2024 | 1332 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED (DATED) 12 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES HEREBY DECLARE THAT THE TRUST FUND AND ALL INCOME ARISING THEREFROM SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST THAT THIS SAME INCOME (AND SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT) SHALL BE APPLIED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS HEREINAFTER CONTAINED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES OR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTE OR INSTRUCTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE PARTICULARLY IN THE FIELDS OF EDUCATION MEDICINE AND HUMANITARIANISM
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
78 Tuckers Court, Richmond Village,
Coral Springs Way,
nr. Witney,
Oxon
OX28 5DG
- Phone:
- 01993894177
- Email:
- HARRYEMSTONE28@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window