THE ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF THE ASCENSION AND ST CHAD, RUGBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 19 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PHILIP NICHOLAS ECONOMOU | Chair | 10 June 2007 |
|
|
||||
Paul Joseph Johnson | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marius Moldovan | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andreea Mihaela Arnautu | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dorian Geoffrey Whittaker | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christophe Bastien | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Athina Bastien | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Wittwer | Trustee | 19 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.96k | £13.99k | £11.67k | £17.61k | £21.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.15k | £16.95k | £15.78k | £16.05k | £19.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUNE 2007 as amended on 07 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TRADITIONS AS CONTAINED IN HOLY SCRIPTURE, AS PRACTISED IN THE LIFE OF THE CHURCH, AS CONFIRMED BY THE OECUMENICAL AND LOCAL COUNCILS AND AS INTERPRETED, PRESERVED AND TAUGHT BY THE GREAT CHURCH OF CHRIST, THE OECUMENICAL PATRIARCHATE OF CONSTANTINOPLE ("THE OBJECTS").
Area of benefit
WARWICKSHIRE, RUGBY AND THE MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 ASHLAWN ROAD
RUGBY
CV22 5ES
- Phone:
- 01788561755
- Email:
- philip.economou@virgin.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window