IHP WORSHIP MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing christian worship feeding the homeless and the needy Multimedia training for the youth Bringing community together through car boot sale Councelling Working in partnership with other charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Luton
Governance
- 03 March 2008: Standard registration
- IHP (Working name)
- IN HIS PRESENCE WORSHIP MINISTRY (Working name)
- Liberty House Worship Ministry (Working name)
- ROYALTEMPLE (Working name)
- TRUE SHELTER INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID FOH-AMOANING BSC,HND,MA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KAYE LEWIS-FLINCH | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
FITZGERALD WEDULO | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MATILDA FOH-AMOANING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.87k | £22.37k | £24.60k | £24.50k | £37.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.03k | £16.81k | £21.44k | £27.68k | £34.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST JUNE 2007 AS AMENDED ON 4 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, AFRICA AND ELSEWHERE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT WHICH ARE IN POOR CONDITIONS OR WOULD BE OTHERWISE NOT AVAILABLE. 2) TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WHO ARE UNEDUCATED OR IN NEED BY PROVISION OF ACCESS TO COMPUTER TECHNOLOGY AND TRAINING AS TO IT'S EFFECTIVE USE WITH A VIEW TO EQUIPPING THEM WITH THE NECESSARY SKILLS TO SEEK AND OBTAIN EMPLOYMENT AND CAREER. 3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS PARTICULARLY AMONGST COMMUNITIES SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF AIDS, DISABILITIES AND WAR. 4) TO RELIEF, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, ANY PERSON IN AFRICA OR ELSEWHERE WHO IS IN THE CONDITION OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY PROMOTING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ADEQUATE ACCOMMODATION OR HOUSING BY CALCULATING TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSON. 5)TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS 2. TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP. OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLD-WIDE ACROSS THE GLOBE. 6) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMICAL CIRCUMSTANCES. 7) THE FURTHERANCE AND PURSUANCE OF THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW, AS THE DIRECTORS/TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM, AFRICA AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 BENINGTON CLOSE
LUTON
LU2 7YJ
- Phone:
- 07399943971
- Email:
- ihpchurch@outlook.com
- Website:
-
ihpministry.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window